MD SB345 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the Chesapeake Shakespeare Company as the State classical theater.
Title
State Designations - State Classical Theater - Chesapeake Shakespeare Company
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Baltimore City
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Symbols
Baltimore City
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Symbols