MD SB346 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a certain dealer or other person from loaning a regulated firearm to a certain borrower under certain circumstances; prohibiting a certain dealer or other person from selling, renting, loaning, or transferring a regulated firearm to a certain person who the dealer or other person knows or has reason to believe intends to commit a certain crime or cause certain harm; creating a certain exception; and providing that a person who is the borrower of a regulated firearm is not required to take a certified firearms safety training course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-37) (Y: 100 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-0) (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-47) (Y: 89 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 458
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (100-37)
2019-04-08HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
2019-04-08HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (41-0)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseDelegates Clippinger, Atterbeary, and Sydnor
2019-04-04HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-04HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-04-04SenateSenators Hough, Carter, and Waldstreicher
2019-04-04SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-04SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-04SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (89-47)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28HouseSpecial Order until 03/29 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {652811/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-03-15HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {888374/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0346&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0346f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0346t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0346e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_458_sb0346e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0346_88837401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0346_65281101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0346_24372601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0346_89392001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/sb0346.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0346_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0554.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0346_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1058.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0346_89392001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1578.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1340.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback