MD SB350 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 476
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 476
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the subject matter of the continuing education ethics course required for the renewal of a license to provide real estate brokerage services by the State Real Estate Commission; and requiring the course to cover the subjects of the practice of flipping, fraudulent real estate practices, and professionalism as it relates to the Maryland Code of Ethics, including a discussion relating to conflict resolution and a licensee's duty to respect the public, peers, and property.
Title
State Real Estate Commission – Continuing Education Requirements – Ethics and Professionalism
Sponsors
Sen. Obie Patterson [D] | Sen. Mary Carozza [R] | Sen. Jason Gallion [R] | Sen. Clarence Lam [D] |
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 476 |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {594231/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1446 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 475
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Ethics
Fraud
Licenses
Real Estate
Time
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Ethics
Fraud
Licenses
Real Estate
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Occupations and Professions | 17 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |