MD SB352 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 318
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 318
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain limitations on the duration of certain tax exemptions for certain manufacturing property in Somerset County do not apply to an exemption granted to Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc.
Title
Somerset County – Property Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property – Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 318 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {165565/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {269536/1 Adopted |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commercial Property
Eastern Shore
Exemptions
Forests and Parks
Industry and Technology
Property Tax
Somerset County
Taxes - Property - Local
Commercial Property
Eastern Shore
Exemptions
Forests and Parks
Industry and Technology
Property Tax
Somerset County
Taxes - Property - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Somerset County | 11 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |