MD SB353 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding pets to the list of items damaged for which a person may be reimbursed from the Black Bear Damage Reimbursement Fund.
Title
Black Bear Damage Reimbursement Fund - Pets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 358 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB897 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 357
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 4 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 423.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |