MD SB354 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 328
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 328
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from 1% to 1.5%, the rate of interest for overdue property tax in Garrett County; etc.
Title
Garrett County - Overdue Property Tax - Interest Rate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 328 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB787 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 327
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 14 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |