MD SB356 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maternal Mortality Review Program, in consultation with the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities, to make recommendations to reduce disparities in the maternal mortality rate, including recommendations related to social determinants of health; requiring the Secretary of Health to include in the annual report regarding the Maternal Mortality Review Program a section on racial disparities that compares certain mortality rates and other demographic measures; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health – Maternal Mortality Review Program – Recommendations and Reporting Requirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 450
2019-03-28SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-28SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {236880/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-25HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-02-22SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-02-20SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-20SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-18SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-02-04SenateHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0356&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0356f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0356t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0356e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_450_sb0356e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0356_23688001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/sb0356.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0356_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0277.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0356_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0953.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0828.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback