MD SB356 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt on each Sunday of the game bird and game mammal season in Calvert County; and authorizing the Department to allow a person to hunt on public land designated for hunting by the Department on Sunday in Calvert County.
Title
Calvert County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB802 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-22 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0356?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0356f.pdf |