MD SB358 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring individuals convicted of child abuse to register with a certain supervising authority by a certain time and to register annually with a local law enforcement unit for a certain term; requiring a certain registration to include a digital image of the registrant that shall be updated at least once each year; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to establish a State child abuse registry and to provide certain information on the Internet; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - State Child Abuse Registry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
2019-02-18SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-13SenateHearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-13SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-04SenateHearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-31SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback