MD SB361 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying that a special charter boat license issued by the Department of Natural Resources is valid for all individuals on a single vessel operated by a certain licensed fishing guide and for certain individuals on a vessel under the guidance of a certain licensed fishing guide in tidal waters of the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources – Special Charter Boat License – Alteration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 260
2019-04-04SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-04SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {320418/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-01HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-02-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-02-26SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-26SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-25SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-31SenateHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0361&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0361f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0361t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0361e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_260_sb0361e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0361_32041801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0001/sb0361.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0361_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0331.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0361_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1132.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1167.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback