MD SB364 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the use or enforcement of a nondisparagement clause in a settlement agreement or other release of liability between the parties in a claim of misconduct in the performance of duties against a law enforcement officer of an institution of higher education in Baltimore City; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Baltimore City - Civil Claims Against Law Enforcement Officers of an Institution of Higher Education - Prohibition Against Nondisparagement Clause in Settlement Agreement
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-37) |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {788076/1 Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Disclosure
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Police Conduct
Public Safety
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Disclosure
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Police Conduct
Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 644 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 10 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |