MD SB365 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain exceptions to provisions of law relating to the display and exhibition of a certain item to a minor, child pornography, and possession of a visual representation of a child under the age of 16 years; prohibiting a minor from engaging in certain conduct involving the display or exhibition of an item to another minor, child pornography, and possession of certain visual representations; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB501 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Attorneys
Child Abuse and Neglect
Citations
Civil Actions
Counties
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disclosure
District Courts
Education
Electronic Government
Evidence
Extortion
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Minors
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Obscenity
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Pleas
Pornography
Privacy
Prostitution
Records
Repeat Offenders
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Solicitation
State's Attorneys
Summonses
Threats
Trials
Video
Vulnerable Adults
Witnesses
Child Abuse and Neglect
Citations
Civil Actions
Counties
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disclosure
District Courts
Education
Electronic Government
Evidence
Extortion
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Minors
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Obscenity
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Pleas
Pornography
Privacy
Prostitution
Records
Repeat Offenders
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Solicitation
State's Attorneys
Summonses
Threats
Trials
Video
Vulnerable Adults
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 10 | 923 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 11 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 11 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 11 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 11 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 11 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 11 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0365?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0365f.pdf |