MD SB368 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Executive Director of the Maryland Aviation Administration to place donation boxes at the entrance to each security screening checkpoint at the Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport; and requiring that money deposited in the donation boxes be appropriated to the Department of Disabilities to be used only to support transitional housing programs for individuals with disabilities.
Title
Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable Donations
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Sen. Johnny Salling [R] | Sen. Andrew Serafini [R] |
Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {419231/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Airports
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Equipment
Gifts
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Labeling
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Transportation - Generally
Airports
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Equipment
Gifts
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Labeling
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Transportation - Generally