MD SB37 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 503
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 503
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a license holder, before each renewal of a Class B or Class H alcoholic beverages license in Anne Arundel County, to attest in a sworn statement that the gross receipts from food sales for the 12-month period immediately preceding the application for renewal were equal to at least 51% of the gross receipts from the sale of food and alcoholic beverages sold for on-premises consumption.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B and Class H Licenses - Renewals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 503 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {384335/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB430 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Fees
Food
Oaths
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Fees
Food
Oaths
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |