MD SB370 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a county to address, in a recycling plan required to be submitted to the Secretary of the Environment, the collection and recycling of recyclable materials from buildings that are 150,000 square feet or greater of office space; requiring each owner of an office building to provide recycling receptacles for the collection of recyclable materials and for the removal of certain materials for further recycling by October 1, 2021; authorizing certain enforcement units to conduct certain inspections; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment – Recycling – Office Buildings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-9) (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-30) (Y: 103 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-13) (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 500
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (36-9)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (103-30)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {570317/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-21HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (33-13)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {154032/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-31SenateHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0370&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0370f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0370t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0370e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0370_15403201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0370_57031701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0370.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0370_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0665.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0370_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1368.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1386.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback