MD SB380 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Office of the Inspector General for General Services as an independent unit of the State; establishing the Inspector General in the Office; providing for the eligibility, professional qualifications, appointment, term, and removal of the Inspector General; providing for the Inspector General's duties and powers when investigating the management and affairs of the Department of General Services; prohibiting the Inspector General from taking certain actions under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Maryland Office of the Inspector General for General Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB122 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Communications
Disclosure
Ethics
Evidence
Fraud
General Services, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Notices
Privacy
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Testimony
Witnesses
Work, Labor, and Employment
Auditors and Audits
Communications
Disclosure
Ethics
Evidence
Fraud
General Services, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Notices
Privacy
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Testimony
Witnesses
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 4 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 4-2A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 4-2A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 4-2A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 4-2A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 4-2A | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 4-2A | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0380?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0380f.pdf |