MD SB381 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Class BA (bowling alley) license in Harford County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue the license to an owner of a bowling alley; specifying that the license entitles the holder to sell beer and wine for on- and off- premises consumption and liquor for on-premises consumption; authorizing the license holder to offer daily on-premises wine tasting and allow customers to carry and consume alcoholic beverages within any place in the bowling alley; establishing a certain fee; etc.
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Bowling Alley License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {274230/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1187 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-06 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Fees
Food
Harford County
Job Training
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Fees
Food
Harford County
Job Training
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |