MD SB382 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting specified licensed marine contractors from specified home improvement contractor licensing requirements; requiring the Department of the Environment to make specified notifications regarding specified wetlands license applications and delineations within 45 days of receipt; requiring the Department to grant, deny, or condition specified tidal wetlands license applications and delineations within 45 days of the time the application is complete under specified circumstances; requiring specified public notice; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marine Contractors - Licensure and Regulation - Tidal Wetlands Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-04 Approved by the Governor
2010-04-06 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (125-16)
2010-04-06 Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (128-6)
2010-04-06 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-04-06 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-04-12 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2010-03-30 Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-23 First Reading Environmental Matters
2010-04-09 Passed Enrolled
2010-04-09 Third Reading Passed (42-5)
2010-04-09 Senate Concur - House Amendments
2010-03-26 Third Reading Passed (37-7)
2010-03-25 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-25 Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) Adopted
2010-03-24 Special Order 3/25 (Senator Harris) Adopted
2010-03-24 Floor Amendment (Education Health and Environmental Affairs) Adopted
2010-03-24 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-03-23 Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2010-03-23 Favorable with Amendments
2010-03-22 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-02-03 Hearing 2/16 at 2:00 p.m.
2010-01-28 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback