MD SB382 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "qualifying not-for-profit organization", for purposes of provisions of law that authorize specified qualifying not-for-profit organizations to participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program, to include a corporation, a limited liability company, or any other entity wholly owned by the Legal Aid Bureau, Inc.; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite Organizations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-2) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 280
2017-03-29SenateReturned Passed
2017-03-28HouseThird Reading Passed (138-2)
2017-03-24HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-24HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-24HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2017-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
2017-02-17HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2017-02-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2017-02-14SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-02-14SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-02-13SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2017-02-09SenateHearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-26SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback