MD SB382 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain residency and other requirements for an applicant for an alcoholic beverages license in Harford County; requiring that an applicant operate and serve as the manager or supervisor of the business conducted on the licensed premises, be responsible for the operation of the license, and be physically present on the licensed premises daily for a substantial amount of time; etc.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Holder Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Harford County
Residency
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Harford County
Residency
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |