MD SB389 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creating an exception to motor vehicle registration requirements for low speed electric vehicles in the City of Havre de Grace that are owned and operated by the City of Havre de Grace; defining a "low speed electric vehicle" as a vehicle capable of a sustained speed of 20 miles per hour but not more than 25 miles per hour; providing that a person who operates a low speed electric vehicle in the City of Havre de Grace may operate the vehicle only on certain roadways and, between dusk and dawn, only under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Low Speed Electric Vehicles - City of Havre de Grace

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {518779/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback