MD SB389 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending and altering the Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill a $12,500,000 appropriation to the Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund for fiscal years 2022 through 2026; altering the purposes for which certain endowment proceeds may be expended; altering certain requirements for certain individuals in certain positions funded by endowment proceeds; altering the distribution of certain revenue from the State admissions and amusement tax in a certain manner; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Extension and Alterations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1585 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-13 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Appropriations
Economic and Community Development
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Laboratories
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Economic and Community Development
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Laboratories
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 6 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 6 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 6 | 614 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 6 | 618 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 2 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0389?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0389f.pdf |