MD SB39 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Planning in coordination with the Maryland State Data Center to study, report on, and make recommendations relating to certain collateral consequences for individuals with criminal records; requiring the Department to report certain information to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2021; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Title
Department of Planning - Collateral Consequences for Individuals With Criminal Records - Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB39 (Carry Over) 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Data
Ex-Offenders
Juries
Licenses
Parents and Guardians
Planning, Department of
Public Officials
Public Safety
Reports
Social Services
Sunset
Voting
Work, Labor, and Employment
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Data
Ex-Offenders
Juries
Licenses
Parents and Guardians
Planning, Department of
Public Officials
Public Safety
Reports
Social Services
Sunset
Voting
Work, Labor, and Employment
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0039?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0039f.pdf |