MD SB392 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting, to between 6 a.m. and midnight, the hours during which a certain person in possession of a vehicle that has been towed or removed from a parking lot is required to provide an opportunity for the vehicle owner or the owner's agent to retake possession of the vehicle; and altering a certain signage requirement imposed on the owner or operator of a parking lot relating to hours during which a towed vehicle may be reclaimed.
Title
Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots - Reclamation Hours
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Boundaries
Motor Vehicles
Parking
Personal Property
Signs and Billboards
Storage
Time
Towing
Transportation - Generally
Motor Vehicles
Parking
Personal Property
Signs and Billboards
Storage
Time
Towing
Transportation - Generally
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 10A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 10A-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |