MD SB393 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB666
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to change the name of the Court of Appeals to be the Supreme Court of Maryland, to change the name of the Court of Special Appeals to be the Appellate Court of Maryland, to change the name of a Judge of the Court of Appeals to be a Justice of the Supreme Court of Maryland, and to change the name of the Chief Judge of the Court of Appeals to be the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court of Maryland; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsors
Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] | Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] |
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {798274/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB393 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Referred Judiciary
HB474 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-24 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
HB474 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-24 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Constitutional Amendments
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Judges
Laws and Ordinances
Legislative Services, Department of
Names
Records
Referendum
Constitutional Amendments
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Judges
Laws and Ordinances
Legislative Services, Department of
Names
Records
Referendum
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
XVII - Quadrennial Elections | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
II - Executive Department | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
III - Legislative Department | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
III - Legislative Department | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
III - Legislative Department | 52 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 3A | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 41E | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 4B | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 5A | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
V - Attorney-General and State's Attorneys | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |