MD SB396 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Legal Representation Fund for Title IX Proceedings as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying that the purpose of the Fund is to provide funds for reasonable costs and attorney's fees for students provided counsel under certain provisions of law; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to administer the Fund; providing for the investment of money in and expenditures from the Fund; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of at least $250,000 to the Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Legal Representation Fund for Title IX Proceedings - Established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-3) (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (116-13) (Y: 117 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
2019-04-02SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (42-3)
2019-04-02SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (116-13)
2019-03-25HouseFloor Committee Amendment {584966/1 Adopted
2019-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-22HouseFavorable with Amendments {344561/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-22HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-03-08HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-31SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0396&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0396f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0396t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0396e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_675_sb0396e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0396_34456101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0396_58496601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/sb0396.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0396_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0419.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0396_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0905.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0934.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback