MD SB397 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 640
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 640
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for certain sales of certain qualified data center personal property for use at certain qualified data centers under certain circumstances; requiring an individual or a corporation to apply to the Department of Commerce for an exemption certificate for the exemption; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to reduce or eliminate the assessment of certain personal property used in certain qualified data centers; etc.
Title
Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax - Exemptions - Data Centers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 124 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 124 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 640 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-6) |
2020-03-17 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (124-4) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {625164/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {459638/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1339 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appeals
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Counties
Data
Enterprise Zones
Exemptions
Inspections
Municipal Corporations
Personal Property
Records
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Property
Taxes - Sales and Use
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Counties
Data
Enterprise Zones
Exemptions
Inspections
Municipal Corporations
Personal Property
Records
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Property
Taxes - Sales and Use
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 11 | 236 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 7 | 246 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |