MD SB399 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring private career schools and certain for-profit institutions of higher education to provide students with information on the placement rate for the program, capability for professional licensure on completion of the program, and median earnings of certain former students before the student signs an enrollment agreement, completes registration, or makes a financial commitment; requiring certain information to be displayed in a certain manner and on the school's or institution's websites; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Protection – Private Career Schools and For–Profit Institutions of Higher Education – Disclosures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (134-2)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-16HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {364433/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-31SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback