MD SB399 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a civil cause of action for damages from theft; establishing that a person may recover certain reasonable costs under a certain cause of action; requiring a person claiming injury may file a request for a waiver of the written demand requirement under certain circumstances; requiring a certain person to give a person who complies with a written demand a certain written release from civil liability; and authorizing a court to award punitive damages for a certain cause of action.
Title
Courts - Civil Causes of Action - Theft
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB478 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Court Costs
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Damages
Injury
Liability
Theft
Civil Actions
Court Costs
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Damages
Injury
Liability
Theft
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 2202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 2203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |