MD SB400 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to determine whether a reportable incident constitutes private inurement if a private nonprofit institution of higher education engages in a reportable incident; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Higher Education Commission - Private Nonprofit Institutions of Higher Education - Regulation (Private Nonprofit Institution of Higher Education Protection Act of 2019)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-3) (Y: 127 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-03-26SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed (126-3)
2019-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-22HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-08HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {344630/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-31SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback