MD SB403 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Behavioral Health Administration to allow an eligible individual to request enrollment into a certain outpatient civil commitment pilot program; requiring the Administration to allow an immediate family member of an eligible individual to request that the individual be voluntarily enrolled into a certain outpatient civil commitment pilot program; etc.
Title
Behavioral Health Administration – Outpatient Civil Commitment Pilot Program – Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2019-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {827075/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Family Law
Forms
Health
Health Care Facilities
Hearings
Human Rights
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Spouses
Agents and Brokers
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Family Law
Forms
Health
Health Care Facilities
Hearings
Human Rights
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Spouses