MD SB404 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health to revise the Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards to repeal the requirements that a school-based health center have a medical director who is a physician and have a physician consultant who is available to discuss clinical issues as needed and to authorize a licensed physician or nurse practitioner to serve as a clinical director or clinical consultant of a school-based health center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Revision

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-03-26SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2019-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-21HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-02-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-02-26SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-26SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback