MD SB405 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain entities to establish and implement a procedure by which a member may receive a prescription drug or device that has been removed from a certain entity's formulary or a member may continue the same cost sharing requirements under certain circumstances; requiring a certain entity to provide a certain member with notice at least 30 days before a change is implemented; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2020; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Formulary Changes
Sponsors
Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Sen. Edward Reilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {567978/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Drugs
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Prices
Time
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Prices
Time