MD SB406 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Senators Zucker, Robinson, and Simonaire
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Senators Zucker, Robinson, and Simonaire
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Elections to include, on request by a local board of elections and with the approval of the applicable county governing body, at least two additional digital scanners for specified polling places as part of the voting system for voting in polling places; requiring specified costs to be apportioned evenly between the State and a county; providing that, except under specified circumstances, a local board shall submit a request to the State Board for additional digital scanners by a specified time; etc.
Title
Election Law - Voting System - Digital Scanners
Sponsors
Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] |
Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-7) (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senators Zucker, Robinson, and Simonaire |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-7) |
2017-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {545565/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {344733/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Ballots
Counties
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Equipment
Prince George's County
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Voting
Ballots
Counties
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Equipment
Prince George's County
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Voting