MD SB407 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit in the Office of the Attorney General for the purpose of protecting seniors and vulnerable adults from financial crimes under ยง 8-801 of the Criminal Law Article; authorizing the Unit to bring civil actions for damages against certain persons; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2022, to appropriate at least $250,000 for the Unit; requiring the Unit to use the funds to hire new staff and investigate and assist the Unit in bringing civil actions; etc.
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations) |
2020-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations) |
2020-03-11 | House | Hearing canceled (Appropriations) |
2020-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred Judiciary Appropriations |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {268274/1 Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Elderly Persons
Fraud
Governor
Harassment
Investigations and Inquiries
Operating Budget
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Property
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Threats
Vulnerable Adults
Work, Labor and Employment
Appropriations
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Elderly Persons
Fraud
Governor
Harassment
Investigations and Inquiries
Operating Budget
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Property
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Threats
Vulnerable Adults
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Corporations and Associations | 11 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 13 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 8 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |