MD SB412 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB156
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain State and local law enforcement agencies to reimburse individuals who take possession of dogs formerly used in law enforcement work under certain circumstances for reasonable and necessary veterinary treatment; specifying that the reimbursement may be only for certain veterinary treatment and may not exceed $2,500 during a calendar year and $10,000 over the life of the dog; authorizing certain State law enforcement agencies to accept public donations for the payment of certain veterinary expenses; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {203424/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {203424/1 (Senator Kramer) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Floor Amendment {203424/1 (Senator Kramer) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {588779/1 Adopted |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Kramer) Adopted |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment {588779/1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Kramer) Adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {588779/1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB412 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Dogs
Gifts
Interest
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Public Safety
Reimbursement Rates
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
State Police, Department of
Veterinarians
Gifts
Interest
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Public Safety
Reimbursement Rates
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
State Police, Department of
Veterinarians
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 3 | 522 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |