MD SB415 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB295
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution relating to the selection and tenure of circuit court judges; altering the method of filling vacancies in the office of a judge of a circuit court; providing for retention elections following an appointment to fill a vacancy in the office of a judge of a circuit court; providing for a transitional period under which the terms of certain amendments are to become effective; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB415 (Carry Over) 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Age
Ballots
Certifications
Circuit Courts
Constitutional Amendments
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Elections
Judges
Names
Public Officials
Time
Voting
Ballots
Certifications
Circuit Courts
Constitutional Amendments
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Elections
Judges
Names
Public Officials
Time
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
XVIII - Provisions of Limited Duration | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 5A | (n/a) | See Bill Text |