MD SB417 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 630
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 630
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on the dwelling house of disabled veterans with a service-connected disability rating of at least 50%; providing for the amount of the property tax credit; requiring certain disabled veterans to provide certain documentation; authorizing certain governing bodies to provide the credit to a certain surviving spouse; applying the Act to tax years after June 30, 2020; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Credit for Disabled Veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 630 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {369932/1 Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB257 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 629
Subjects
Counties
Disabilities
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Records
Spouses
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Disabilities
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Records
Spouses
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 265 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |