MD SB421 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the date by which certain provisions of law relating to minority business participation goals for certain applicants or licensees are of no effect and may not be enforced from July 1, 2019, to July 1, 2020; and altering a deadline for a certain reporting requirement.
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Enforcement and Reporting
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] |
Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Obie Patterson [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {689434/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Data
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Minorities
Records
Reports
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Time
Video
Data
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Minorities
Records
Reports
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Time
Video