MD SB422 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the employment categories of certain employees of the State Department of Education; requiring that all positions in the Department be appointed positions in the professional service and skilled service as well as the executive service and management service, subject to a certain exception; requiring the Department to determine which employment classifications would be described as being in the skilled service or the professional service; providing certain requirements for employees hired beginning July 1, 2019; etc.
Title
State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-41) (Y: 98 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-41) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | House | Reassigned to Appropriations |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Public Employees
School Administration
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Education, State Department of
Public Employees
School Administration
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment