MD SB426 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that growers, processors, and dispensaries licensed under certain provisions of law are subject to the Maryland Antitrust Act and the Maryland Sales Below Cost Act; repealing the provision prohibiting the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission from issuing more than one medical cannabis grower license to each applicant; requiring the Commission to allow a person to have an ownership interest in or control of up to four dispensaries licensed under a certain provision of law; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Cannabis – Regulation of Dispensaries, Growers, and Processors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-7) (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-1) (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (129-7)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-04-04HouseHearing canceled
2019-04-04HouseHearing 4/05 at 11:00 a.m.
2019-04-04HouseHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-04HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-04-03HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (42-1)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02SenateSubstitute Floor Amendment {573620/2 (Senator West) Adopted
2019-04-01SenateSpecial Order until 4/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFloor Amendment {573620/2 (Senator West)
2019-04-01SenateFloor Amendment {573620/1 (Senator West) Withdrawn
2019-03-29SenateSpecial Order until 4/1 (Senator West) Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFloor Amendment {573620/1 (Senator West)
2019-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {468570/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-27SenateSpecial Order until 3/28 (Senator West) Adopted
2019-03-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {468570/1
2019-03-19SenateSpecial Order until 3/26 (Senator West) Adopted
2019-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {468570/1
2019-03-13SenateSpecial Order until 3/19 (Senator West) Adopted
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {468570/1
2019-03-12SenateLaid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {468570/1
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-01SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0426&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0426f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0426t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_501_sb0426t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0426_46857001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0426_57362001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0426_57362002.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/sb0426.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0426_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1091.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1439.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0426_hgo.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback