MD SB427 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 706
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 706
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county board of education to ensure that each public school provide, at no charge to students, menstrual hygiene products via dispensers in the women's restrooms at the school; requiring a public middle or high school to install menstrual hygiene product dispensers in at least two women's restrooms by October 1, 2022, and in all women's restrooms by August 1, 2025; requiring a public elementary school to install menstrual hygiene product dispensers in at least one restroom by October 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 706 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (104-31) |
2021-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {635362/1 Adopted |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {244439/1 Adopted |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB205 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 705
Subjects
Age
Education, Boards of
Equipment
Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Public Schools
restrooms
Students
Women
Education, Boards of
Equipment
Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Public Schools
restrooms
Students
Women