MD SB428 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 660
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a beauty salon and barbershop beer and wine license in Queen Anne's County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to holders of certain beauty salon or barbershop permits; specifying that the license authorizes the license holder to sell beer or wine by the glass for on-premises consumption to a customer receiving cosmetology or barbering services; prohibiting a customer from consuming more than 5 ounces of wine or 12 ounces of beer during any one visit; providing a $100 annual license fee; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 660
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (46-1)
2019-03-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {474930/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback