MD SB429 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to provide a report to committees of the General Assembly and the Medicaid Advisory Committee at least 90 days prior to making any change to medical eligibility for specified Medical Assistance Program long-term care services; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Medical Eligibility for Nursing Facility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-28 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) | |
2010-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-12 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-01 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Nursing Homes
Patients
Reports
Disabilities
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Nursing Homes
Patients
Reports