MD SB429 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating the intent of the General Assembly with regard to the dispersion of group homes and alternative living units; requiring group homes and alternative living units to maintain a specified distance from specified facilities; limiting the number of group homes or alternative living units in a specified area based on population size; exempting group homes operational before January 1, 2013, from the requirements of the Act; etc.
Title
Developmental Disabilities - Group Homes and Alternative Living Units -
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn | |
2012-02-03 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0429.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0429f.pdf |