MD SB429 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring institutions of higher education that receive State funds to provide specified information to students regarding their education loans; requiring the education loan information to be provided annually; providing that specified information may include a specified statement; prohibiting an institution of higher education from incurring a specified liability, under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Student Loan Notification Letter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-6) (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-6) (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Senate | Veto sustained (0-44) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-6) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {824362/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {404133/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Higher Education
Notices
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Tuition
Electronic Communication
Higher Education
Notices
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Tuition