MD SB433 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB608
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the University of Maryland School of Medicine to provide clinical care at the University of Maryland Capital Region Medical Center by assigning faculty who specialize in neuroscience, obstetrics and gynecology, oncology, and vascular neurology; requiring the University of Maryland School of Medicine to provide specialized clinical care at certain rural hospitals by assigning faculty who specialize in essential areas; requiring the Governor, in fiscal years 2023 through 2025, to provide certain appropriations; etc.
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - State Funding - Revision
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 44 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0) |
2021-03-25 | House | Floor Amendment {543722/1 (Delegate Jacobs) Adopted |
2021-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments {904660/1 Adopted |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {129931/1 Adopted |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB173 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 418
SB608 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
SB608 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Community Colleges
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Higher Education
Revenue and Taxes
State Universities and Colleges
Baltimore City
Budgets
Community Colleges
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Higher Education
Revenue and Taxes
State Universities and Colleges
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 16 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 16 | 512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 17 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |