MD SB442 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a claim filed with the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board is subject to the applicable provisions of the Administrative Procedure Act; and providing that, if a claimant requests a hearing after the Board has issued proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law, or orders, the Board shall hold a hearing before the Board issues final findings of fact, conclusions of law, or orders.
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Right to Hearing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (137-2) | |
2010-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-05 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2010-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-04 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |