MD SB442 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the dispersal of specified Project Open Space funding to the costs associated with development projects and the construction of recreational facilities under specified circumstances; and exempting specified indoor recreational facilities from specified funding limits if the Department of Natural Resources makes a specified determination.
Title
Program Open Space - Local Projects - Funding for Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (126-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-21 | Hearing 4/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-17 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-16 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-14 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments 864930/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Construction
Counties
Program Open Space
Sports and Recreation
Swimming Pools
Zoning and Planning
Construction
Counties
Program Open Space
Sports and Recreation
Swimming Pools
Zoning and Planning