MD SB442 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding the Dorchester County Sanitary Commission as an eligible governmental unit in the Employees' Pension System; and providing that specified individuals are subject to the alternate contributory pension benefit in the Employees' Pension System in the same manner as specified other individuals.
Title
Employees' Pension System - Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Eligible Governmental Unit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |